Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a barbershop and beauty salon beer and wine license in Anne Arundel County; specifying the individuals who are qualified to hold the license include the holder of a barbershop permit or a beauty salon permit; authorizing the holder of a license to serve not more than 5 ounces of beer or wine to a customer for on-premises consumption; specifying the hours during which a license holder is authorized to serve beer and wine; stating that a license holder need not obtain a certain Sunday license; specifying a fee of $100; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0361
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {433395/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-3)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable with Amendments {433395/1 Adopted 38
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Barbershop and Beauty Salon License
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-3) 41
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1002, 11-102 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:59 PM