Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System – Death Benefits for Children
Sponsored by
Delegate M. Jackson (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering certain provisions of law related to the time until which certain survivor benefits for surviving children of certain members of the State Retirement and Pension System are available; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0462
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {224262/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System – Death Benefits for Children
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits for Children - Age
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {224262/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System – Death Benefits for Children
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 9:30 a.m.
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Age
(   21-401, 24-401.1, 26-401.1, 27-403, 27-404, 27-405, 29-301 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:59 PM
Click to return on the top page