Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration - Renewal
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Acevero, Bhandari, Boyce, Cardin, Chisholm, Crutchfield, Hill, Johnson, Kerr, Lehman, Lisanti, Lopez, McKay, Moon, Morgan, Mosby, Parrott, Saab, Shetty, Shoemaker, Smith, Terrasa, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the system of multiyear vehicle registration adopted by the Motor Vehicle Administration include for Class A (passenger) vehicles and Class D (motorcycle) vehicles options for registration for 1- or 2-year periods to be phased in over a certain period of time; requiring the Administration to make available certain methods of obtaining or renewing a vehicle registration for Class A (passenger) and Class D (motorcycle) vehicles; authorizing certain late fees for certain registration renewals; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1054
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Registration - Renewal
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Registration - Renewal
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-413, 13-910 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:59 PM