Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Delegate Beitzel
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending the termination date applicable to certain provisions relating to the purpose, use, and funding of the State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund from June 30, 2022, to June 30, 2027.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0450
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Purpose, Use, and Funding - Sunset Extension
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:44 PM
Click to return on the top page