Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Fines and Fees - Possession, Display, or Renewal of Registration
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Acevero, Boyce, Crutchfield, R. Lewis, Lierman, Moon, and Wells
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the fine for failing to possess a vehicle registration card while driving or to display a vehicle registration card during a traffic stop by establishing a $10 fine rather than a maximum fine of $500; authorizing a court to waive a fine imposed under the Act; authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to charge a $25 late fee for registration renewals that occur more than 1 week after a registration has expired; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Fines and Fees - Possession, Display, or Renewal of Registration
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-409, 13-910 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:58 PM