Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Meeting Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making clarifying changes to certain additional meeting requirements for a council of unit owners; requiring notice of an initial properly called meeting of a council of unit owners to include certain information under certain circumstances; requiring an additional meeting of a council of unit owners to be held no earlier than 15 days after the initial properly called meeting; requiring a certain notice of an additional meeting of the council of unit owners to be delivered, advertised, or posted in a certain manner; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0535
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1037 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Meeting Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Meeting Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-21)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Meeting Requirements
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Second Reading Passed 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Meeting Requirements
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (117-21) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Returned Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 10:28 AM
Click to return on the top page