Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Vehicle Fleet - Conversion to Zero-Emission Passenger Cars and Other Light-Duty Vehicles
Sponsored by
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (96-40)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the intent of the General Assembly that a certain percentage of passenger cars and other light-duty vehicles in the State vehicle fleet be zero-emission vehicles by certain years; requiring the State to ensure that a certain minimum percentage of vehicles purchases for the State vehicle fleet in certain fiscal years are zero-emission vehicles, subject to the availability of funding; requiring the Department of General Services to ensure the development of certain charging infrastructure; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1233 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Vehicle Fleet - Conversion to Zero-Emission Electric Vehicles
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {640714/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-40)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - State Vehicle Fleet - Conversion to Zero-Emission Electric Vehicles
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Favorable with Amendments {640714/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Vehicle Fleet - Conversion to Zero-Emission Passenger Cars and Other Light-Duty Vehicles
House 4/12/2021 3/30/2021 Third Reading Passed (96-40) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 11:32 AM
Click to return on the top page