Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals
Sponsored by
Delegates Charkoudian, Boyce, Cain, Crutchfield, Feldmark, Fraser-Hidalgo, Korman, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Love, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, Solomon, Stewart, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain person that generates food residuals to separate the food residuals from other solid waste and ensure that the food residuals are diverted from final disposal in a refuse disposal system in a certain manner; applying the requirements of the Act, beginning in certain years, to certain persons that generate certain amounts of food residuals; requiring the Department of the Environment to report to the General Assembly by December 1, 2021, and annually thereafter on the impact of waste diversion in the State; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1701, 9-1724.1, 9-201 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:57 PM