Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cecil County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Federal Facilities Redevelopment Areas
Sponsored by
Cecil County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for certain construction material or warehousing equipment purchased for use in a certain federal facilities redevelopment area in Cecil County under certain circumstances; requiring a buyer claiming the exemption to provide to the vendor evidence of eligibility issued by the Comptroller; and terminating the Act after June 30, 2031.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0294
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2021
Legislative Date
1/21/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Cecil County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Federal Facilities Redevelopment Areas
House 1/21/2021 1/21/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
(   11-241 )
Last Updated: 2/19/2021 12:26 PM
Click to return on the top page