Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that certain maximum penalty amounts the Maryland Commission on Civil Rights is authorized to seek if it finds that a respondent has engaged in a discriminatory act regarding public accommodations and certain actions by persons licensed or regulated by a unit in the Maryland Department of Labor do not apply if the discriminatory act is committed by the agent or employee of the respondent; requiring any civil penalties collected under the Act be paid to the complainant, not the General Fund; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0364
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0317 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-34)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45
Text - Third - Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (99-34) 47
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/13/2020 4:40 PM