Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - License to Produce Hemp - Limitation
Sponsored by
Delegates Cardin, Hettleman, and Stein
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain licensing requirement for producing hemp in the State; prohibiting the Department of Agriculture from issuing a license to a person to produce hemp if the Department determines that the land subject to a license application is located within 25 feet of a property or properties with three or more individual residences, unless the person agrees to produce hemp in an indoor facility that exhausts its fumes to the outside with an approved apparatus; requiring the Department to make a certain determination; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Agriculture - License to Produce Hemp - Limitation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Agriculture - License to Produce Hemp - Limitation
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-308 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:56 PM