Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Net Energy Metering - Limit
Sponsored by
Delegate Clippinger
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing to 3,000 megawatts the statewide limit on rated generating capacity for net energy metering under a certain contract or tariff available to certain eligible customer-generators.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0407
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electricity - Net Energy Metering - Limit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Electricity - Net Energy Metering - Limit
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-37)
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Electricity - Net Energy Metering - Limit
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Electricity - Net Energy Metering - Limit
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (95-37) 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Referred Finance 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/25/2021 3:34 PM
Click to return on the top page