Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 612
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Continuing the State Board of Physicians and the related allied health advisory committees by extending to July 1, 2030, the termination provisions relating to statutory and regulatory authority of the State Board of Physicians and the committees; altering the reasons for which a disciplinary panel of the Board is authorized to deny a certain license or refuse to renew or reinstate an applicant's license under certain circumstances; altering the content of a certain annual report by the Board; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0395
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 6 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {286884/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 612
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {286884/1 Adopted 46
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 47A
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 612
Text - Chapter - State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-1201, 13-1204 )
(   1-401, 14-101, 14-201, 14-205, 14-205.1, 14-206, 14-208, 14-302, 14-302.1, 14-306, 14-307, 14-309, 14-312, 14-312.1, 14-316, 14-321, 14-401.1, 14-402, 14-404, 14-405.1, 14-407, 14-409, 14-411.1, 14-412, 14-413, 14-414, 14-501, 14-502, 14-506, 14-5A-08, 14-5A-09, 14-5A-10, 14-5A-13, 14-5A-17, 14-5A-18, 14-5A-19, 14-5A-22.1, 14-5A-23, 14-5A-25, 14-5B-01, 14-5B-04, 14-5B-05, 14-5B-09, 14-5B-10, 14-5B-12, 14-5B-14, 14-5B-15, 14-5B-16, 14-5B-18.1, 14-5B-19, 14-5B-21, 14-5C-09, 14-5C-11, 14-5C-14, 14-5C-17, 14-5C-18, 14-5C-19, 14-5C-22.1, 14-5C-23, 14-5C-25, 14-5D-05, 14-5D-08, 14-5D-09, 14-5D-11, 14-5D-11.1, 14-5D-11.2, 14-5D-11.3, 14-5D-12, 14-5D-14, 14-5D-15, 14-5D-16, 14-5D-18, 14-5D-20, 14-5E-09, 14-5E-11, 14-5E-13, 14-5E-16, 14-5E-18, 14-5E-19, 14-5E-23, 14-5E-25, 14-5F-04.1, 14-5F-07, 14-5F-11, 14-5F-12, 14-5F-15, 14-5F-18, 14-5F-22, 14-5F-24, 14-5F-29, 14-5F-32, 14-602, 14-702, 15-103, 15-202, 15-203, 15-302, 15-302.1, 15-303, 15-304, 15-307, 15-308, 15-311, 15-314, 15-315, 15-316, 15-402.1, 15-403, 15-502, 1-604 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:55 PM