Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 249
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Continuing the State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2031, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; and requiring, on or before December 31 each year, the Board to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on the Board's disciplinary activities for the previous fiscal year.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0394
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 249
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 50
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Returned Passed 49B
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 249
Text - Chapter - State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-301, 2-302, 2-304, 2-316 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:55 PM