Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Training Requirements - Hate Crimes
Sponsored by
Delegates Lopez, Acevero, Attar, Atterbeary, D. Barnes, Bartlett, Boyce, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Cullison, W. Fisher, Forbes, Grammer, Guyton, Henson, Hettleman, Korman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Love, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Rosenberg, Shetty, Solomon, Stewart, Turner, Wilkins, and Williams
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 237
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to require entrance-level and in-service police training conducted by the State and each county and municipal police training school to include in their curriculum training relating to the criminal laws concerning recognition of, reporting of, and response to hate crimes.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0633
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0699 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 237
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Training Requirements - Hate Crimes
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Training Requirements - Hate Crimes
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Returned Passed 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 237
Text - Chapter - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Training Requirements - Hate Crimes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:54 PM
Click to return on the top page