Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education – Council on the Fair Treatment of Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Anderton, Barron, Cardin, Crosby, Hornberger, J. Lewis, Love, Mosby, Rosenberg, Shetty, and Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Council on the Fair Treatment of Student Athletes; providing for the composition, chair, terms, and staffing of the Council; requiring the Council to report its findings and recommendations to the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland and the Board of Regents of Morgan State University; prohibiting certain institutions of higher education from taking certain actions to prevent student athletes from earning compensation from the use of the student athlete's name, image, or likeness; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0518
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020, July 1, 2022
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education – Council on the Fair Treatment of Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act)
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-201, 14-101, 14-102, 15-126, 15-127 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:54 PM