Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Phase Out Company Giveaways Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Stewart, Acevero, Boyce, Lehman, R. Lewis, Moon, Palakovich Carr, and Solomon
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Interstate Compact to Phase Out Company Giveaways as a compact among member states; stating the findings of member states; prohibiting member states from offering or providing certain company giveaways as an inducement to relocate certain facilities to a member state subject to certain exclusions; authorizing member states to withdraw from the Compact with 6 months' notice in a certain manner; establishing the National Board of the Interstate Compact to Phase Out Company Giveaways; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Phase Out Company Giveaways Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Text - First - Phase Out Company Giveaways Act
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:54 PM