Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Bagnall, Buckel, Kipke, R. Lewis, and Szeliga
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 230
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing certain controlled dangerous substance prescriptions to be dispensed on an electronic prescription; requiring, except under certain circumstances, a certain health practitioner to issue a prescription for a controlled dangerous substance electronically; authorizing an authorized prescriber to issue a written or oral prescription for a controlled dangerous substance only under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2022
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {736281/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
42A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {543127/1 (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 230
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {736281/1 Adopted 41
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 42A
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Referred Finance 43
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Floor Amendment {543127/1 (Senator Kelley) Adopted 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (45-0) 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 230
Text - Chapter - Drugs and Devices - Electronic Prescriptions - Controlled Dangerous Substances
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-501, 5-504, 5-701 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:53 PM