Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Lapse - Active Duty Military Personnel
Sponsored by
Delegates Crosby and C. Watson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an insurer from canceling, failing to renew, or reducing certain private passenger motor vehicle insurance coverage due to a lapse in coverage of the policyholder if the lapse occurred while the policyholder was deployed overseas with the United States armed forces.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Lapse - Active Duty Military Personnel
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Lapse - Active Duty Military Personnel
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-613 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:52 PM