Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Wiretapping - Misconduct in Office
Sponsored by
Delegate Moon
Status
In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding misconduct in office to a certain list of crimes for which certain evidence may be gathered by, and a judge may grant an order authorizing, interception of oral, wire, or electronic communications.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0440
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Wiretapping - Misconduct in Office
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {162916/1 Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Mautz) Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Courts - Wiretapping - Misconduct in Office
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {162916/1 Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Mautz) Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17AClick to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/26/2021 5:57 PM
Click to return on the top page