Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes – Mitigation – Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Sponsored by
Delegates Palakovich Carr, Moon, Acevero, Attar, Bartlett, Barve, Bridges, Cardin, Carr, Charkoudian, Cullison, D.M. Davis, Feldmark, Fraser-Hidalgo, Guyton, Kerr, R. Lewis, Lopez, Love, Mosby, Pena-Melnyk, Qi, Queen, Reznik, Shetty, Smith, Stewart, Terrasa, C. Watson, Wilkins, Anderson, Atterbeary, Cox, W. Fisher, and Williams
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that the discovery or perception of, or belief about, another person's race, color, national origin, sex, gender identity, or sexual orientation, whether or not accurate, does not constitute legally adequate provocation to mitigate a killing from the crime of murder to manslaughter or an assault from the crime of assault in the first degree to assault in the second degree or another lesser crime.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0554
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Crimes - Mitigation - Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {232514/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-1)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Crimes - Mitigation - Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {232514/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Crimes – Mitigation – Race, Color, National Origin, Sex, Gender Identity, or Sexual Orientation
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-1) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47 Click to view Recorded Media
(   2-207, 3-209 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:52 PM
Click to return on the top page