Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Driver’s Licenses and Vehicle Registrations – Distribution of Tax Payments – Tax Clinics for Low–Income Marylanders
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that each fiscal year $250,000 of undisputed taxes collected as a result of the Motor Vehicle Administration's refusal to renew or transfer certain vehicle registrations or renew the driver's license of certain applicants be distributed to the Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders Fund; establishing the Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders Fund to provide grants to certain law schools to operate tax clinics for low-income Marylanders; requiring the Secretary of Higher Education to administer the Fund; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {745468/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-30)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Ways and Means and Economic Matters
Text - First - Driver's Licenses and Vehicle Registrations - Distribution of Tax Payments and Unemployment Insurance Contributions - Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments {745468/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Driver’s Licenses and Vehicle Registrations – Distribution of Tax Payments – Tax Clinics for Low–Income Marylanders
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (104-30) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 53AClick to view Recorded Media
(   11-409 )
(   13-406.2, 16-115 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:51 PM
Click to return on the top page