Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Public Schools and Youth Sports Programs - Tackle Football
Sponsored by
Delegate Walker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting a certain tackle football season to the months of August through December; prohibiting a county board of education or school from offering, approving, or sponsoring tackle football games during the months of January through July; prohibiting a youth sports program from providing tackle football games to youth athletes during the months of January through July; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Public Schools and Youth Sports Programs - Tackle Football
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Public Schools and Youth Sports Programs - Tackle Football
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-36)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Public Schools and Youth Sports Programs - Tackle Football
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38
Text - Third - Education - Public Schools and Youth Sports Programs - Tackle Football
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Third Reading Passed (101-36) 40
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 40
Senate 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   7-433.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:50 PM