Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle and Homeowner's Insurance - Use of Claim History in Rating Policies
Sponsored by
Delegates C. Watson, Bagnall, Bhandari, Branch, Brooks, Charkoudian, Crosby, Crutchfield, Cullison, Dumais, Fennell, Healey, Hettleman, C. Jackson, Lierman, McIntosh, Patterson, Reznik, Rogers, Saab, Terrasa, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, and Turner
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an insurer, with respect to private passenger motor vehicle insurance, from increasing the premium for an insured based on a homeowner's insurance claim; and prohibiting an insurer, with respect to homeowner's insurance, from increasing the premium for an insured based on a private passenger motor vehicle insurance claim.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0470
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {753797/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-39)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Motor Vehicle and Homeowner's Insurance - Use of Claim History in Rating Policies
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {753797/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle and Homeowner's Insurance - Use of Claim History in Rating Policies
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (100-39) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Finance 33 Click to view Recorded Media
(   27-501 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:50 PM
Click to return on the top page