Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Relations - Places of Public Accommodation - Pricing of Goods and Services
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Acevero, Carr, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fraser-Hidalgo, Guyton, Hettleman, Kelly, R. Lewis, Love, Palakovich Carr, Shetty, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, Valderrama, C. Watson, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting the owner or operator of a place of public accommodation or an agent or employee of the owner or operator from selling or offering for sale certain substantially similar products or services if the products or services are priced differently based on gender; and providing that a certain violation is within the scope of the enforcement duties and powers of the Division of Consumer Protection of the Office of the Attorney General.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Human Relations - Places of Public Accommodation - Pricing of Goods and Services
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   20-1016, 20-301, 20-304 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:49 PM
Click to return on the top page