Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Acevero, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Kelly, Kerr, R. Lewis, and Stewart
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from importing, selling, or offering for sale any juvenile product, mattress, upholstered furniture, or reupholstered furniture that contains more than 0.1% of flame-retardant chemicals by mass; repealing certain provisions of law regarding the importing, sale, or offering for sale of any child care product containing certain chemicals; establishing certain civil penalties; requiring the Secretary of Health to consider certain factors in determining the amount of a certain penalty; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0447
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {806389/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-34)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments {806389/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (99-34) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Finance 53AClick to view Recorded Media
Age
(   24-306, 24-306.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:49 PM
Click to return on the top page