Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Opioid Restitution Fund - Office of the Chief Medical Examiner
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the authorized uses of the Opioid Restitution Fund to include supporting the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner for increased caseloads due to opioid overdose deaths.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Opioid Restitution Fund - Office of the Chief Medical Examiner
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Opioid Restitution Fund - Office of the Chief Medical Examiner
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:49 PM
Click to return on the top page