Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Distribution – Tax Clinics for Low–Income Marylanders
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that each fiscal year the Comptroller distribute $250,000 of income tax revenue from individuals to the Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders Fund; establishing the Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders Fund to provide grants to the University of Maryland School of Law, the University of Baltimore School of Law, and the Maryland Volunteer Lawyers Service to operate tax clinics for low-income Marylanders; requiring the Secretary of Higher Education to administer the Fund; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0480
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/10/2020
Legislative Date
7/10/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Distribution – Tax Clinics for Low–Income Marylanders
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2021
Legislative Date
1/07/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/10/2020 7/10/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Distribution – Tax Clinics for Low–Income Marylanders
House 1/07/2021 1/07/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/1/2021 10:02 AM
Click to return on the top page