Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government – Open Meetings – Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Carr, Kipke, and Szeliga
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 202
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain State agencies to make publicly available on their websites open meeting agendas 48 hours in advance of each meeting or, under certain circumstances, as far in advance of the meeting as practicable; requiring certain State agencies to post on their websites certain meeting minutes not more than 2 business days after the minutes are approved; requiring certain State agencies to maintain on their websites meeting minutes for 5 years and video recordings and certain audio recordings for a minimum of 1 year after a meeting; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0363
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {346787/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 202
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Government – Open Meetings – Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act)
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {346787/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Government – Open Meetings – Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act)
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 202
Text - Chapter - State Government – Open Meetings – Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act)
(   10-604, 10-607 )
(   2-101, 2-102 )
(   2-101, 2-108 )
(   4-201, 4-211 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:49 PM
Click to return on the top page