Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Memory Care and Alzheimer's Disease Unit Regulations
Sponsored by
Delegate Belcastro
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the Maryland Department of Health adopt certain regulations that establish specific standards governing memory care and Alzheimer's disease units in assisted living programs, including certain training requirements, certain staffing pattern requirements, certain activity requirements, certain admissions and discharge criteria, and certain other procedures, and that require compliance by assisted living programs with the standards; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0204
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/23/2020
Legislative Date
10/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2021
Legislative Date
1/25/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 10/23/2020 10/23/2020 Pre-filed
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health Care Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Memory Care and Alzheimer's Disease Unit Regulations
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 Hearing canceled
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/25/2021 1/25/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/1/2021 1:55 PM
Click to return on the top page