Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Purse Dedication Account - Maryland Horse Industry Fund - Retired Racehorses
Sponsored by
Delegates Krimm, Pena-Melnyk, and B. Barnes
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that 0.5% of the funds in the Purse Dedication Account be allocated to the Maryland Horse Industry Fund to be used to fund and award grants to be used for the care, retraining, and promotion of retired racehorses; requiring the Maryland Horse Industry Board to administer the money made available to the Fund; requiring that certain unspent or unencumbered balances in the Fund at the end of the fiscal year revert to the Purse Dedication Account; and providing for the reversion of unused funds.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Purse Dedication Account - Maryland Horse Industry Fund - Retired Racehorses
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-708.2 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:49 PM