Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Immigration Enforcement - Public Schools, Hospitals, and Courthouses - Policies
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins, Charkoudian, Feldmark, W. Fisher, Hill, Ivey, Kaiser, Lehman, Lierman, Love, Luedtke, Moon, Mosby, Pena-Melnyk, Rosenberg, Shetty, Solomon, Stewart, and Terrasa
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Attorney General, in consultation with certain stakeholders, to develop guidelines to assist public schools, hospitals, and courthouses to draft policies that limit civil immigration enforcement activities on their premises in order to ensure these facilities remain safe and accessible to all; and authorizing public schools, hospitals, and courthouses to establish and publish policies that limit immigration enforcement on their premises to the fullest extent possible; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0903
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1273 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
42A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Moon) Adopted
Proceedings
42A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {663522/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (43-89)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {193429/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (49-83)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {713527/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (44-88)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-45)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Immigration Enforcement - Public Schools, Hospitals, and Courthouses - Policies
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable Adopted 42A
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Moon) Adopted 42A
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Floor Amendment {663522/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (43-89) 43A
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Floor Amendment {193429/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (49-83) 43A
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Floor Amendment {713527/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (44-88) 43A
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed 43A
Text - Third - Immigration Enforcement - Public Schools, Hospitals, and Courthouses - Policies
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (93-45) 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:48 PM