Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports
Sponsored by
Delegate Guyton
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to establish a model policy to support the educational and parenting goals and improve the educational outcomes of pregnant and parenting students; requiring the model policy to include certain policies and procedures; requiring each county board of education to establish a policy based on the Department's model policy; and altering the required contents of the pregnant and parenting students attendance policy developed by each county board.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0438
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/27/2020
Legislative Date
10/27/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/27/2020 10/27/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Public Schools - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports
Last Updated: 1/31/2021 5:42 PM
Click to return on the top page