Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - Student Performance Reports - Students With Disabilities
Sponsored by
Delegates Guyton, Bhandari, Cain, Forbes, Hettleman, Kerr, Metzgar, Palakovich Carr, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each report on student performance that is published by the State Department of Education to include data disaggregated by student status under § 504 of the federal Rehabilitation Act of 1973 and the federal Individuals with Disabilities Education Act.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - State Department of Education - Student Performance Reports - Students With Disabilities
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-420 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:47 PM