Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Certifying Providers
Sponsored by
Delegate Kipke
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 187
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "certifying provider" to include physician assistants that have an active, unrestricted license to practice, have an active delegation agreement with a primary supervising physician who is a certifying provider, and are in good standing with the State Board of Physicians; and altering the membership of the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0304
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {726784/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
42A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 187
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Certifying Providers
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {726784/1 Adopted 41
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Certifying Providers
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 42A
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Referred Finance 43
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 50
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Returned Passed 49A
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 187
Text - Chapter - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Certifying Providers
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3301, 13-3303 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:47 PM