Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland National Guard - Tuition Assistance Program - Modifications
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Adams, Anderton, Arentz, Arikan, Beitzel, Buckel, Chisholm, Ciliberti, Clark, Corderman, Cox, Ghrist, Griffith, Hartman, Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mangione, Mautz, McComas, McKay, Metzgar, Otto, Pippy, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Szeliga, and Wilson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 180
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from 50% to 100%, the percentage of tuition that may be reimbursed of the cost of in-State tuition for certain courses for any active National Guard member attending certain institutions; and expanding the definition of "member" as it relates to who can receive tuition reimbursement to include any individual who holds a commission in the National Guard.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0282
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland National Guard - Tuition Assistance Program - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland National Guard - Tuition Assistance Program - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 180
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland National Guard - Tuition Assistance Program - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland National Guard - Tuition Assistance Program - Modifications
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland National Guard - Tuition Assistance Program - Modifications
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 180
Text - Chapter - Maryland National Guard - Tuition Assistance Program - Modifications
(   13-405 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:46 PM
Click to return on the top page