Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
Sponsored by
Charles County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 175
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing Charles County to use the proceeds from the issuance of certain tax increment financing bonds for convention centers, conference centers, or visitors' centers, to maintain infrastructure improvements at the centers, and to market development district facilities; making certain financing, refinancing, and reimbursement contingent on the review and approval of the Board of County Commissioners of Charles County; authorizing Charles County to establish minority participation goals for development projects; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0431
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {375062/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 175
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {375062/1 Adopted 47
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (126-0) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 49
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 51A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Returned Passed 51
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 175
Text - Chapter - Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:27 PM