Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Mental Health – Confidentiality of Medical Records and Emergency Facilities List
Sponsored by
Delegates Bagnall, Cullison, Kipke, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Belcastro, Bhandari, Carr, Charles, Chisholm, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Krebs, R. Lewis, Morgan, Reilly, Rosenberg, Saab, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 172
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "health care provider" for the purposes of provisions of law governing the confidentiality of medical records to include comprehensive crisis response centers, crisis stabilization centers, and crisis treatment centers; providing that the list of emergency facilities the Maryland Department of Health is required to publish may include comprehensive crisis response centers, crisis stabilization centers, crisis treatment centers, and outpatient mental health clinics; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0441
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {326480/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 172
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Mental Health - Emergency Facilities List - Comprehensive Crisis Response Centers, Crisis Stabilization Centers, and Crisis Treatment Centers
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {326480/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Mental Health – Confidentiality of Medical Records and Emergency Facilities List
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Finance 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 172
Text - Chapter - Mental Health – Confidentiality of Medical Records and Emergency Facilities List
(   10-621, 4-301, 7.5-207 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:45 PM
Click to return on the top page