Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools – Medical Cannabis – Guidelines for Administration to Students (Connor’s Courage)
Sponsored by
Delegates Lisanti, Boteler, Grammer, and Johnson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, on or before December 1, 2020, the State Department of Education and the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission jointly to develop guidelines for public schools regarding the administration of medical cannabis to certain students during school hours and school-sponsored after-school activities; providing for the contents of the guidelines; requiring, on or before December 1, 2020, the Department and the Commission jointly to provide certain technical assistance to schools; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0605
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Schools – Medical Cannabis – Guidelines for Administration to Students (Connor’s Courage)
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/04/2020 2/05/2020 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-446 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:45 PM