Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Authority to Impose Fees for Use of Disposable Bags PG 401-20
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing Prince George's County to impose, by law, a fee on certain retail establishments for the use of disposable bags as part of a retail sale of products; limiting the amount of the fee to 5 cents for each disposable bag used; restricting the use of the fee; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Prince George's County - Authority to Impose Fees for Use of Disposable Bags PG 401-20
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:45 PM