Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Schedule II Controlled Dangerous Substances - Partial Filling of Prescriptions
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Bagnall, Carr, Charles, Cullison, Ebersole, Feldmark, Haynes, Kelly, Kittleman, Krebs, Krimm, R. Lewis, Miller, Shetty, Smith, Terrasa, and C. Watson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a certain authorized provider to partially fill a prescription for a controlled dangerous substance listed in Schedule II in a quantity less than the prescribed amount on request of the patient; authorizing a certain authorized provider to fill the remaining portion of a partially filled prescription if the remaining portion is dispensed within a certain time period and by a certain authorized provider; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Schedule II Controlled Dangerous Substances - Partial Filling of Prescriptions
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-501 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:44 PM