Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Water Pollution - Stormwater Management Regulations and Watershed Implementation Plans - Review and Update
Sponsored by
Delegates Love and Henson
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to review and update certain regulations at least once every 5 years; requiring the Department to propose the first update to certain regulations on or before January 1, 2022; requiring the Department to review and update certain regulations in a certain manner; requiring the Department to take certain actions at least 6 months before the proposal of regulations under the Act; altering the time by which the Department must hold a certain public hearing; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0227
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Water Pollution - Stormwater Management Regulations and Watershed Implementation Plans - Review and Update
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Last Updated: 3/1/2021 5:23 PM
Click to return on the top page