Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Alcohol Awareness PG 301-20
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 155
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring in Prince George's County a holder of a certain alcoholic beverages license or an individual designated by the license holder and employed in a supervisory capacity to be certified by an approved alcohol awareness program and to be present on the licensed premises at all times when alcoholic beverages may be sold; and establishing a penalty of $250 for a first violation of the Act, $500 for a second violation, and for each subsequent offense, a fine not to exceed $1,000 or a suspension or revocation of the license, or both.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prince George's County - Alcohol Awareness PG 301-20
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {933896/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Prince George's County - Alcohol Awareness PG 301-20
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 155
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Prince George's County - Alcohol Awareness PG 301-20
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Prince George's County - Alcohol Awareness PG 301-20
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {933896/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prince George's County - Alcohol Awareness PG 301-20
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (128-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 155
Text - Chapter - Prince George's County - Alcohol Awareness PG 301-20
(   26-102, 26-1901, 26-1902.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:43 PM
Click to return on the top page