Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup on Statewide Vehicle Crash Data Collection and Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegate R. Lewis
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup on Statewide Vehicle Crash Data Collection and Reporting; requiring the Workgroup to examine the processes used to collect and report statewide vehicle crash data for injuries and fatalities, examine the categories into which the data is disaggregated and reported, and determine the most effective manner for the State to begin to collect, disaggregate, and report the data by race and ethnicity; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations on or before December 1, 2021; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1324 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/28/2020
Legislative Date
10/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Workgroup on Statewide Vehicle Crash Data Collection and Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/28/2020 10/28/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Workgroup on Statewide Vehicle Crash Data Collection and Reporting
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:27 PM
Click to return on the top page