Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sewage Treatment Plants - Effluent Discharges - Impacts on Midge Populations
Sponsored by
Delegate Grammer
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to monitor effluent discharged from sewage treatment plants and evaluate whether the effluent impacts midge populations in the surrounding land and water areas; and requiring the Department to report to the General Assembly on or before October 1 each year, beginning in 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/18/2020
Legislative Date
9/18/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {210317/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/18/2020 9/18/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Sewage Treatment Plants - Effluent Discharges - Impacts on Midge Populations
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {210317/1 Adopted 10AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Sewage Treatment Plants - Effluent Discharges - Impacts on Midge Populations
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
(   9-321.3 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:27 PM
Click to return on the top page