Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Private Passenger Automobile Insurance – Use of Telematics
Sponsored by
Delegates C. Watson and Dumais
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a private passenger automobile insurer to use data obtained through telematics from a specific vehicle only for establishing an insurance premium for a policy that insures that vehicle if the named insured consents to the data collection for claims investigation purposes including fraud, or for rate filing purposes using aggregated telematics data; authorizing an insurer to sell or exchange for other consideration certain aggregated telematics data only under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Private Passenger Automobile Insurance – Use of Vehicle Telematics
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {333197/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Private Passenger Automobile Insurance – Use of Telematics
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-42)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Private Passenger Automobile Insurance – Use of Vehicle Telematics
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {333197/1 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Private Passenger Automobile Insurance – Use of Telematics
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (96-42) 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Finance 46
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-908 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:42 PM