Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight
Sponsored by
Delegate Shetty
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a certain forensic genetic genealogical DNA analysis and search may not be initiated without certifying certain information before a court and obtaining a certain authorization from the court; prohibiting certain biological samples subjected to certain forensic genetic genealogical profile analysis to be used to determine certain information about a certain donor; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to produce a certain annual report; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0187
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2021
Legislative Date
1/31/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight
House 1/31/2021 1/31/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
(   17-101 through 17-105 )
Last Updated: 2/26/2021 1:45 PM
Click to return on the top page