Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Department of Information Technology - Cybersecurity
Sponsored by
Delegates Carey, Charkoudian, Crosby, C. Watson, Bagnall, Bhandari, Carr, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reilly, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Information Technology, in consultation with the Attorney General, to advise and oversee a consistent cybersecurity strategy for units of State government, including institutions under the control of the governing boards of public institutions of higher education; requiring the Secretary, in consultation with the Attorney General, to develop guidance on consistent cybersecurity strategies for counties, municipal corporations, certain other entities and political subdivisions; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0120
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {966889/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Government - Department of Information Technology - Cybersecurity
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {966889/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Government - Department of Information Technology - Cybersecurity
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 33 Click to view Recorded Media
(   3A-101, 3A-301, 3A-303 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:41 PM
Click to return on the top page