Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, McIntosh, Feldmark, Acevero, Bagnall, Boyce, Clippinger, Conaway, Cullison, D.M. Davis, Fennell, Healey, Hettleman, Korman, Krimm, Lehman, R. Lewis, Love, Luedtke, McKay, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Reznik, Rosenberg, Shetty, Smith, Stewart, Terrasa, Valderrama, Wells, Brooks, Fraser-Hidalgo, Harrison, Holmes, J. Lewis, Ruth
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 116
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding the housing policy of the State to include providing for fair housing to all citizens regardless of source of income; stating the Act seeks to deconcentrate poverty by providing additional opportunities for tenants utilizing public subsidies to live in certain neighborhoods; prohibiting a person from refusing to sell or rent a dwelling to any person because of source of income; establishing qualifications and limitations on the prohibition against discrimination in housing based on source of income; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0530
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0451 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {840115/1
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/10 (Delegate Holmes) Adopted
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {840115/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-42)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-15)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 116
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {840115/1 43A
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/10 (Delegate Holmes) Adopted 43A
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {840115/1 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (95-42) 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (31-15) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 116
Text - Chapter - Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:23 PM