Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Plastic Bag Reduction Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Fraser-Hidalgo, Acevero, B. Barnes, Boyce, Cain, Cardin, Carr, Charkoudian, Clippinger, D.E. Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Feldmark, W. Fisher, Guyton, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Holmes, Kelly, Korman, Lehman, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lopez, Love, Luedtke, McIntosh, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Reznik, Shetty, Solomon, Stein, Stewart, Terrasa, Washington, C. Watson, Wells, Wilkins, Williams, K. Young, Barve, Ruth
Status
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting, on or after July 1, 2021, a certain retail establishment from distributing plastic carryout bags to a customer at the point of sale; providing that, on or after July 1, 2021, only the State may enact a law or take other action to prohibit, restrict, or regulate the use of certain plastic bags by a retail establishment, that certain authority of a county or municipality is preempted, and that certain laws or ordinances are superseded; requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0313
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Plastics and Packaging Reduction Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {530619/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/11 (Delegate Cox) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {683623/1 (Delegate Cox) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Plastic Bag Reduction Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-37)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Plastics and Packaging Reduction Act
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {530619/1 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/11 (Delegate Cox) Adopted 44
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Floor Amendment {683623/1 (Delegate Cox) Adopted 45
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Plastic Bag Reduction Act
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Third Reading Passed (95-37) 46
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Finance 47
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:40 PM